Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Forde, Eunice B, Forde, Wayne, Independent Savings Plan Company, Fawn Ridge Maintenance Association Inc, Fawn Ridge Homeowners Association Inc, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2014 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Homestead -3- $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER ON - TO - FOR | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS , VACATE JUDGMENT AND RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS - |
|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION, DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS, VACATE JUDGMENT AND RETURN THE ORIGINAL NOTE, ORIGINAL MORTGAGE AND ORIGINAL LOAN MODIFICATION AGREEMENT |
|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JUDICIAL SALE | |
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL SALE CANCELLED | |
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER ON - TO - FOR | |
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR | |
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY OF HELEN M. SKALA, ESQ. AS NEW COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF - WAITING FOR ORDER |
|
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING SET FOR 07/27/16 @ 2 PM - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.