Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Collins Asset Group Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Bruce, Giselle L, Bruce, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Cook, J.. Martha presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ON - TO - FOR | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE AGREEMENT SIGNED |
|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM MEDIATION RE: TELEPHONIC MEDIATION |
|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM MEDIATION RE: TELEPHONE MEDIATION TO MARK POLLACK ESQ |
|
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE **RESCHEDULED** - DECEMBER 9, 2016 @ 9:00 AM |
|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE CASE CANCELLED/NOT RESCHEDULED. 48 NOTICE - YES DEFT |
|
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.