Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mubaidin, Elaine B, Mubaidin, Hisham O, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Bank Of America Corporation, Bank Of America, N.A., Provident Mortgage Corp T A Court Square Funding Group Inc, Wendover Financial Services Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF DISINTEREST |
|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF DISINTEREST |
|
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/10/15 AT 2:00 PM |
|
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK MAILED ON 1/29/15 |
|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK (FILING #23048477) |
|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT (FILING #23048477) |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION | |
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 2/4/15 @ 2:30PM ROOM 503 |
|
November 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK MAILED ON 11/3/14 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.