Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Aleman, Blanca, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Depositors Insurance Company, Nationwide Ins Co, Spencer, Chad, Spencer, Kimberly, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Rice, G. Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: June 30, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL | |
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE | |
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION 4/29/15 @12:15PM |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S CHAD SPENCER AND KIMBERLY SPENCER'S WITNESS LIST OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE STRIKE |
|
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST DEFT'S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.