Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Diaz, Anita, Unknown Spouse Of Anita Diaz, Unknown Tenant In Possession Of, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Kiser, D. Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2014 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Nonhomestead -2- $50,000 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION HRG SET FOR 12/5/2016 IN C/R #1 BEFORE THE HONORABLE RONALD FICARROTTA |
|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X3 attorney@padgettlaw |
|
June 30, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
June 30, 2014 | Docket Event | LIS PENDENS | |
June 30, 2014 | Docket Event | FILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA | |
June 30, 2014 | Docket Event | E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
June 30, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
June 30, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
June 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Certification of Original Note Possession FS702.015(4) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.