Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Camacho, Marlaina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Weaver, Ashley Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Levens, P. William presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2014 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION MARLAIMA CAMACHO- 8/13/14 @ 9 AM/ JENNIFER MARY COLLINS 8/13/14 @ 10:30 AM/ FUNMILAYO G JOHNSON 8/13/14 @ 11 AM/ KEITH JEROME POLK 8/13/14 @ 11:30 AM/ ROBERT F RISAVY 8/13/14 @ 1 PM/ JEROME THOMAS 8/1 |
|
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION AUGUST 13, 2014 JENNIFER MARY COLLINS 9AM; FUNMILAYO G. JOHNSON 9:30AM; KEITH JEROME POLK 10AM; ROBERT F. RISAVY 10:30AM; JEROME THOMAS 11AM; HANNAH WILLIAMS 11:30AM |
|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT |
|
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON ASHLEY NICHOLE WEAVER ON 5/2/14 |
|
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED X1 MAIL@DDJLAWFIRM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.