Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dyck-Oneal Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Yi, Alex, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Stephens, Scott. Steven presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | BANKRUPTCY | |
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF GARNISHEE TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT |
|
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETURNED SERVED JAEHWA LLC, 07/27/16 |
|
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL INTERNAL AND CHANGE OF ADDRESS - DANIEL C CONSUEGRA |
|
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT ISSUED lawsuitnotices@consuegralaw |
|
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM CLERK WOCGI lawsuitnotices@consuegralaw |
|
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE WOCGI lawsuitnotices@consuegralaw |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILED MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
November 07, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.