Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Branch Banking And Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Jones, Callie, Unknown Spouse Of Callie Jones, Temlin, Charlotte, Unknown Spouse Of Charlotte Temlin Aka, Tenant 1, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER | |
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT BALANCE PAID $45,200, DOC STAMPS $316.40, REG FEES $685.50 |
|
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Fee Worksheet | |
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT GOOD FAITH $2,260 |
|
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event | BID INFORMATION SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.