Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Everbank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Atwell, Jason P, River Oaks Condominium Ii Association Inc, River Oaks Recreation Assoc Inc, Tenant #1, Unknown, Tenant #2, Unknown, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Fee Worksheet | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | BID INFORMATION SHEET | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
ASSIGNMENT OF BID TO FNMA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.