Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Le, Quynh B, Truong, Sarah, Truong, Tu, Huynh, Thanh, Vo, Bemuoi, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Martellato, Clara Lubeseder, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Rice, G. Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2014 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL | |
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING MINOR SETTLEMENT 01/06/16 EGR |
|
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
SEE DOCKET TEXT COURT MEMORANDUM - HEARING DISPOSITION / RULING |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENT |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
SEE DOCKET TEXT COURT MEMORANDUM - HEARING DISPOSITION/RULING |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION FOR PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR SETTLEMENT 01/05/2016 11 AM |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT IMPASSE |
|
November 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.