Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cornette, Gary V filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE IMAGE AND VERIFIED AS OF THIS DATE | |
November 21, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE IMAGE AND VERIFIED AS OF THIS DATE | |
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
SEE DOCKET TEXT DETAIL CALENDAR REPORT |
|
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
SEE DOCKET TEXT DETAIL CALENDAR REPORT |
|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
SEE DOCKET TEXT SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
ADMINISTRATIVE FILE OPENED "This file has been created pursuant to Administrative Order S-2006-146 (signed September 22, 2006) which directs the Clerk of the Circuit Court to open an Administrative File and thereafter to open a new Clerk's administrative file on the first busi |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.