Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weld, Giovanni, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Hansen, Jacob Thomas, Hansen, Patricia Anne, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsom, R. Claudia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING FINAK DISPOSITION |
|
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FO 7/23/15 @ 3PM |
|
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE **AMENDED** ON 07/23/15 AT 3:00 PM |
|
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 7/23/15 @3PM |
|
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY |
|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF RESPONSE TO THE DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.