Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Can Capital Asset Servicing Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Salerno, Syomara, S&P Universal Code Trading Company Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Battles, L. Emmett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event | BANKRUPTCY | |
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY DEFT |
|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY ---GRANTED 1/4/17 ELB |
|
November 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 1/04/17 AT 9:00 AM |
|
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY |
|
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK REQUESTING REOPEN FEE | |
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED $50 FEE ASSESSED | |
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES IN AID OF EXECUTION; INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT IN AID OF EXECUTION - SYOMARA SALERNO - 10/5/15 |
|
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, SYOMARA SALERNO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.