Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Estate Of Timothy Patrick Cosgrove, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Jimmie Jean Wilbur, M.D., P.A., Wilbur, M.D., Jimmie J., in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Battles, L. Emmett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF EXHIBIT DISPOSAL MAILED |
|
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT JURY TRIAL | |
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event | JURY VERDICT | |
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event | JURY INSTRUCTIONS | |
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
EVIDENCE DATA SHEET PLTF 13184 & DEFT 13185 |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S NOTES FROM 6 DAY JURY TRIAL |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTES OF JURY TRIAL | |
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
WITNESS(ES) SWORN X 1 |
|
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING DEFT'S PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (52 PGS) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.