Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Velo, Aida, Aida V Velo Trust, United States Of America, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER | |
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT:WRIT OF POSSESSION |
|
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED HCSO Ck# 143779 |
|
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE A WRIT OF POSSESSION- CLERK ISSUE A WRIT OF POSSESSION PUTTING PLTF IN POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES- JRPJR 09/04/14 |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE HEATHER E. CRAIG, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION EXHIBITS ATTACHED |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PRIMARY AND SECONDARY E-MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE | |
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.