Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
U S Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Mohammed, Rachel, Estate Of Jamal Mohammed, Capital One Bank Usa National Association, Mohammed, Zarina, Unknown Spouse Of Zarina Mohammed, (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Kiser, D. Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION- 3/3/16 MDK Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF 02/11/16 MDK Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF AMANDA RENEE MURPHY, ESQ Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MATTHEW J RODRIGUEZ, ESQ Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
November 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Fee Worksheet
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.