Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Federal National Mortgage Association, filed a(n) Declaratory Judgment case against Bayshore Condominium & Company Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Silver, C. Bernard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSilver, C. Bernard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2013 |
CategoryDeclaratory Judgment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | DO NOT ENTER ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS | |
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION WITH | |
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
CASE CONSOLIDATED TO 13-CA-14872 PER ORDER SIGNED ON 06/11/14 BY BCS |
|
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR | |
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF DEBORAH CARTER EXHIBIT 1 |
|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
AMENDED COMPLAINT *FIRST* FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF / COS APRIL 2, 2014/ EXHIBITS ATTACHED |
|
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.