Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kelly, Yolanda, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Publix Super Markets Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Wolfe, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2013 |
CategoryPremises Liability-Commercial |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | ACCEPTANCE OF OFFER OF JUDGMENT | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED COS APRIL 15, 2014 |
|
March 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT NOTICE OF SERVING COS 3/31/14 |
|
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED COS MARCH 28, 2014 |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED | |
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.