Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cusseaux, Alanah, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Estate Of John Morse, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Silver, C. Bernard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO ATTORNEY: RE-GARDING NEW CASE DIV. H CHRISTOPHER M. NIGRO ESQ. & CRISTINA ACOSTA BLUNT ESQ. & JAINNA R. SEABORNE ESQ. Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM CLERK
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO IMPOSE CHARGING LIEN Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION *SUPPLEMENTAL* Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY DATED JANUARY 14, 2014 Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.