Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Thpi Acquisition Holdings, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Capital One Bank, Hfc Collection Center Inc, Mhc Financial Services Inc, United States Of America, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: December 06, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK MAILED ON 2/17/14 Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING MARCH 25, 2014 9AM Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA 12/17/13 Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED HFC COLLECTION CENTER INC. 12/18/13 Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED MHC FINANCIAL SERVICES INC 1-2-14 Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AGAINST DFDT HFC COLLECTION CENTER, INC Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF REFORECLOSURE Judge: Judge, Senior |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.