Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hsbc Bank Usa National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Clerk Of Court Hillsborough County Florida, Figueroa, Ivan, State Of Florida Department Of Revenue, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: December 09, 2013E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: December 09, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Disclaimer of Interest / ANSWER |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 40 DAYS / THE STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE 12/23/13 |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #2 IN POSSESSION OF THE PROPERTY |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1 IN POSSESSION OF THE PROPERTY |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF IVAN FIGUEROA |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED THE CLERK OF COURT, HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY, FLORIDA 12/27/13 |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED IVAN FIGUEROA 12/24/13 |
|
December 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X6 - ComplaintsEfiling@mlg-defaultlaw |
|
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE Judge: Judge, Senior |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.