Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Us Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Pray, Bonnie C, Pray, Jack Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Kiser, D. Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR MTN TO STRIKE IS GRANTED/DENIED IN PART Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS', JACK THOMAS PRAY AND BONNIE C. PRAY, SECOND AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
AMENDED ANSWER (SECOND) AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
|
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (FIRST) Judge: Kiser, D. Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.