Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-1, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Fisk, Marielle, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Rice, G. Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AFTER HEARING | |
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION HEARING 8/28/15 10AM |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL 5/19/14 SSS |
|
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED SUMMONS SERVED ON MARIELLE FISK 1/21/14 - NO SUMMONS ATTACHED |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL OF POLLACK & ROSEN, P.A. AS FIRM FOR PLAINTIFF |
|
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event | FILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA | |
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X 1 AnthonyC@w-legal.com ; SCL_EfilingReceipts@w-legal |
|
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event | E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.