Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Anderson, Monica, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Bg Installers Corp, Gonzalez, Benito, Lopez, Jose Vasquez, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Silver, C. Bernard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: December 09, 2013E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: December 09, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 05-07-2014 @2:30PM / RM #519 / RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED B.G. INSTALLERS CORP. 12/11/13 Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED JOSE VASQUEZ LOPEZ Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED BENITO GONZALEZ 12/11/13 Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.