Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Harper, Cathy, Harper, Martin, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Safe Harbor Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Levens, P. William presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | FILE REDACTED | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING |
|
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING 5/27/14 @2PM |
|
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT; 5/27/14 @ 2PM; ROOM 502 |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 05/27/2014 11:15 AM |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY EXHIBITS ATTACHED |
|
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST |
|
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS ALTERNATIVELY OR MTN FOR DEFINITE STATEMENT AND MEMO OF LAW IN SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.