Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Weseman , Melanie S., against Chau, Quoc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with LAUREL M LEE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AFTER HEARING | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM CLERK RE: SUMMONS / legalpleadings@pollackrosen |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PROCESS ON THE DEFT & PLTF SHALL HAVE 120 DAYS IN WHICH TO SERVE AND GOOD CAUSE IS **GRANTED** |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION HRG SET FOR 04-06-2018 @ 9:00 AM IN C/R 502 BEFORE THE HONORABLE LAUREL M LEE |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
REMOVED FROM DISMISSAL DOCKET MOTION FILED 1/28/16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.