Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-2, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Elie, Greg, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Hinson, Carl. C. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
ORDER
Date: May 08, 2017ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION
Date: April 28, 2015REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: December 09, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Hinson, Carl. C. |
|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE
Judge: Hinson, Carl. C. |
|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: Hinson, Carl. C. |
|
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE MOTION AND SET HEARING WITHIN 30 DAYS - SIGNED BY GPH Judge: Hinson, Carl. C. |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420
Judge: Hinson, Carl. C. |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON WEBEX DURING UNIFORM MOTION CALENDAR - 7/13/20 @ 9:00 AM Judge: Hinson, Carl. C. |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-FILED MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT NOT ISSUED NO F/J IN CASE (F/J'S IN 13-CA-10863 & 13-CA-14916) ATTY NOTIFIED 8/16/19 Judge: Hinson, Carl. C. |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT NOT ISSUED Judge: Hinson, Carl. C. |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
INFORMATION ONLY NOT ISSUED NO F/J IN CASE (F/J'S IN 13-CA-10863 & 13-CA-14916) ATTY NOTIFIED Judge: Hinson, Carl. C. |
|
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT NOT ISSUED Judge: Hinson, Carl. C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.