Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Easton Park Homeowners Association Of New Tampa Inc, Lusane, Andrina E, Lusane, Merlin A, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Kiser, D. Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RECEIVED 1/9/16 BY MARINOSCI LAW GROUP, P.C. |
|
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER RETURNED ORIGINAL NOTE TO MARINOSCI LAW GROUP, P.C. 100 W CYPRESS CREEK RD. STE 1045, FT LAUDERDALE, FL. 33309 (ORDER) SIGNED PER ORDER ON 100615 BY MDK |
|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT | |
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING SET FOR 9/11/15 @ 9 A.M. |
|
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK REQUESTING REOPEN FEE | |
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event | REOPEN FEE ASSESSED $50 | |
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS LIS PENDENS VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE RELEASE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND DISMISS FORECLOSURE CASE |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JUDICIAL SALE DOS 3/26/15 @ 10AM |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL SALE CANCELLED | |
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE TAMPA BAY TIMES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.