Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Grant Park Addition Homeowners Association Inc, Jackson, Deborah, Reynolds, Ethel, Reynolds, Lenbert G, Suntrust Bank, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Battles, L. Emmett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER | |
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER RETURNED ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE TO- MARINOSCI LAW GROUP PA 100 W. CYPRESS CREEK RD. STE 1045 FT. LAUDERDALE, FL 33309 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER (AO S-2015-O49 07/15) |
|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT BLANCE PAID; AUCTION BALANCE $68,042.70; CLERK FEES $1,074.00; DOC STAMPS $497.70 |
|
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Fee Worksheet | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT GOOD FAITH $3,555 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.