Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society,Fsb,D B A Chrisiana Trust,......, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Beaudin, David, Beaudin, Melanie J, Unknown Tenant, Westchase Community Association, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY
Date: September 01, 2016MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: October 03, 2018PRE-TRIAL MEMORANDUM
Date: September 01, 2017OBJECTION
Date: August 31, 2017RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 14, 2015FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: February 07, 2019PRETRIAL STATEMENT OF
Date: September 01, 2017REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: August 31, 2017ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR
Date: October 19, 2016ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: April 24, 2015MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: February 14, 2014ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF
Date: August 24, 2018NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: September 04, 2015COMPLAINT
Date: December 06, 2013NOTICE OF FILING
Date: April 27, 2015MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 08, 2014RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: July 23, 2014STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: December 20, 2018AMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: November 05, 2014REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: June 18, 2014E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: December 06, 2013REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: December 06, 2013REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: August 08, 2017REPLY
Date: September 01, 2017MOTION TO - FOR
Date: July 13, 2017REQUEST FOR
Date: May 17, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
UNCLAIMED FUNDS SENT TO FINE & FORFEITURE ACCT PER FS 116.21
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DUPLICATE Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Fee Worksheet
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
BID INFORMATION SHEET
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE
Judge: Judge, Senior |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.