Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Petoskey, David J, Gibbons, William T, Jr, filed a(n) Other case against Mastropietro, Larry, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Wolfe, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2013 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
PETITION UNOPPOSED / TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW |
|
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 2/4/14 1045am |
|
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE RESPONDENT ACCEPTS SERVICE OF THE UNOPPOSED PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRIATION AWARD AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | FILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA | |
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT UNOPPOSED PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET DUPLICATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.