Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Habitat For Humanity Of Hillsborough County Florida Inc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Smith, Annette Chester, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Rice, G. Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: December 06, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION 4/29/16 10:00-12:00 PM COURTROOM 504 Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK
Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK DUE TO RESPONSE FILED 03-24-2014 Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO SUMMONS Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ANNETE CHESTER SMITH Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X 1 msmith@carltonfields.com ; bwoolard@carltonfields |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.