Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Federal National Mortgage Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Bayshore Condominium & Company Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Nielsen, A. Richard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ATTONEY'S FEES AND COSTS 04/22/16 MDK |
|
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING JANUARY 20, 2016 AT 9:00 AM, ROOM #500 |
|
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
INTERROGATORIES DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF |
|
August 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
AMENDED MOTION TO - FOR DETERMINE DEFENDANT AS PREVAILING PARTY & FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS |
|
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES | |
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR | |
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FINAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.