Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Green Tree Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Bessette, Mary A, Colonial Hills Homeowners Association Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: December 06, 2013E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: December 06, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF BORROWER NON PARTICIPATION VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 8/22/14 9AM EST - DFDT'S MOTION TO DISMISS - ROOM 510 Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
AMENDED MOTION TO - FOR TO DISMISS Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
May 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
FORM A FILED
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR AFFIRMATIVE RELIEF Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION JRP 4/1/14 Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES / DEMAND FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Judge: Judge, Senior |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.