Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Henry, Oriel, Lee, Jessica, Bea, Justin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Miles, Tanece, Scrivens Miles, Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Bergmann, E. Charles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBergmann, E. Charles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2013 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT AGREEMENT |
|
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL | |
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFIED COPIES OF FELONY CONVICTIONS |
|
October 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED COS 10/10/2014 X3 |
|
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR RECORDS W/O DEPOSITION X 17 |
|
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR RECORDS W/O DEPOSITION X 13 |
|
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR RECORDS W/O DEPOSITION X 12 |
|
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.