Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lebron, Denise, filed a(n) Injunction case against Womens Care Florida Llc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Levens, P. William presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLevens, P. William Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2013 |
CategoryInjunction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL | |
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR SET ASIDE CLERK'S DEFAULT AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DFDT TO ANSWER PLTF'S COMPLAINT |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
JOINT MOTION TO SET ASIDE THE CLERK OF COURT'S DEFAULT AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DFDT TO ANSWER PLTF'S COMPLAINT |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE THAT CAUSE IS AT ISSUE AND READY TO BE SET FOR TRIAL |
|
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK MAILED ON 1/22/14 |
|
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK | |
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED | |
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X1 EMAIL:mkimbrow@wfclaw |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.