Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Heppenstall, Alexandra, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Standifer, Maurice, Travelers Property Casualty Ins Co, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Wolfe, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolfe, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL | |
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT THE CASE WAS COMPLETELY SETTLED, COUNSEL WILL SUBMIT A NOTICE OR STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OR OTHER FINAL DISPOSITION |
|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION |
|
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT | |
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
November 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION / MARCH 19, 2015 |
|
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 03/17/2015 9 AM |
|
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ALEXANDRA HEPPENSTALL 12/10/14 @ 9:00AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.