Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Connell David O'Brien P.A., filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Estate Of Samuel D Lee, Green Mountain Finance Fund Llc, Lee, Alex, Lee, David, Lee, Katherin, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM | |
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK MAILED ON 3/12/14 |
|
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 04/01/2014 3:15 PM |
|
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON GREEN MOUNTAIN FINANCE FIND LLC ON 2/14/14 |
|
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK MAILED ON 1/29/14 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.