Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gte Federal Credit Unions, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Clerk Of Court Of Hillsborough County, Pashola Smith, Azeezat O, Sims, Laetitia, Smith, Kenniatha V, State Of Florida Department Of Revenue, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Rice, G. Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COMPLAINT
Date: December 02, 2013E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: December 02, 2013ORDER DIRECTING
Date: June 16, 2017COURT MEMORANDUM
Date: March 29, 2018ORDER DIRECTING
Date: May 26, 2017ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF
Date: November 08, 2016REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: December 02, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER
Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER RETURNED ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE TO- PHELAN HALLINAN DIAMOND & JONES, PLLC., 2001 N.W. 64TH STREET, SUITE 100, FORT LAUDERDALE, FL 33309 (ORDER) SIGNED PER ORDER 02/01/19 BY EGR Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RETURN OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE AND MORTGAGE **GRANTED** 02/1/19 EGR Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS PROMISSORY NOTE AND MORTGAGE Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE FROM AMBER BLENMAN Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens WITHOUT PREJUDICE Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens
Judge: Rice, G. Elizabeth |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.