Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Persad, Navin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Rodriguez, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Battles, L. Emmett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER | |
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL JT ON 11/09/15-11/20/15 AT 8:30 AM RM 502, PR ON 10/29/15 AT 2:30 PM RM 509, BEOFRE THE HONORABLE BERNARD C. SILVER.......05/29/15 BCS |
|
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON PROCEDURES FOR TRIAL 05/29/15 BCS |
|
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL; COONTINUANCE OF TRIAL IS GRANTED AND RESET THE COURT'S NOVEMBER 9,2015 TWO WEEK TRIAL DOCKET FOR WHICH THE COURT WILL ISSUE A SEPRATE TRIAL ORDER. JUDGE B.C.SILVER 05/29/2015 |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY RESPONSES- BCS 5/1/15 |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES |
|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO SUBPOENA | |
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.