Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Campbell, Khrishna, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Harris, Robert, Florida Suncoast Plastering Inc., in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Arnold, D. James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2013 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY |
|
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 11/7/14 @ 10 AM |
|
September 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO - FOR SETTING CAUSE FOR MEDIATION |
|
August 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY CVS PHARMACY |
|
August 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY ANKLE AND FOOT CENTER OF TAMPA BAY |
|
August 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL JURY TRIAL DURING THE WEEK(s) OF JUNE 15, 2015, AT 9:00A.M. PRE TRIAL HELD ON JUNE 8, 2015, AT 9:30A.M. JUDGE J.D.A. 08/27/2014 |
|
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED COS 8/14/14 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.