Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lopez, Javier, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., Oyen, Mark Albert, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Rice, G. Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER RATIFYING MEDIATION STIPULATION | |
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL | |
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL | |
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE THURSDAY, FEBRUARY 26,2015, AT 1:30P.M. |
|
October 31, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES JAVIER LOPEZ |
|
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.