Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
M & T Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Hoepker, Salena S., Hoffman, Stephen Alan, Kct Inc, Suntrust Bank Na, Unknown Tenant In Possession 1, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT BALANCE PAID $ 48,328.50 + CLERK FEES $ 765.00 + DOC STAMPS $ 353.50 |
|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Fee Worksheet | |
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT GOOD FAITH DEPOSIT $ 2,525.00 |
|
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event | BID INFORMATION SHEET | |
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE BUSINESS OBSERVER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.