Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Auto Owners Insurance Company, Brown, Bertha, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Betancourt, Samantha Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Cook, J.. Martha presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCook, J.. Martha Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR | |
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING NOT ATTAC AFF OF COSTS |
|
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS PROOF OF CLAIM |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST SAMANTHA NICOLE BETANCOURT / APRIL 15, 2014 AT 9:15AM / RM #508 |
|
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST SAMANTHA NICOLE BETANCOURT |
|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES | |
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGATORIES, REQUEST TO PRODUCE, REQUEST FO ADMISSIONS NOT ATTAC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.