Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Black Pearl Limousine, Faubion, Daniel, Gleckler, Kenrick, Halsnik, Thomas, filed a(n) Civil case against Crist, Victor, Hillsborough County Public Transportation Commission, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Nielsen, A. Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNielsen, A. Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
MANDATE AFFIRMED 2D15-1722 |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER FROM DCA 06/09/16 2D15-1722 |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER FROM DCA 10/15/15 2D15-1722 |
|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER FROM DCA 10/12/15 2D15-1722 |
|
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
APPEAL ADDITION 15-1722-addition |
|
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (AMENDED) W/ FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMIN 2.516 |
|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
SEE DOCKET TEXT 15-1722-record.pdf SENT ELECTRONICALLY TO DCA [ONLY] |
|
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | 2DCA RECORD ON APPEAL | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | FEE LETTER SENT | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
APPEAL CASE PREPARED FOR COURT 10 VOLUMES PREPARED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.