Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Acevedo, Kimberly, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Rodriguez, Reyes, Safety-Kleen Systems Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Wolfe, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolfe, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 13, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC s.t |
|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New File Sent to R/C |
|
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM FERNANDEZ & HERNANDEZ LLC |
|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION EXPERT |
|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING NT ATTAC RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES |
|
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS' CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY |
|
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS SECOND |
|
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.