Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Onewest Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Dennis E Reinhard, Estate Of Barbara A Dlugokecki, United States Of America, Gerard Services Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Senior Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Homestead -2- $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER | |
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
REPORT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM, GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM AND REQUEST FOR DISCHARGE |
|
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF ATTY AD LITEM, GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMININISTRATOR AD LITEM |
|
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT BALANCE PAID $75,900, DOC STAMPS $531.30, REG FEES $1,146 |
|
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Fee Worksheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.