Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Landings Of Tampa Condominium Association, Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Mt. Hawley Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Thomas, K. Cheryl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas, K. Cheryl Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AFTER HEARING | |
July 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM CFO |
|
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION 1ST DAY OF JUNE, 2016 at 1:30PM |
|
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE REMOVAL |
|
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL |
|
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES OF MELISSA M. SIMS, ESQ AND SCOTT M. JANOWITZ, ESQ |
|
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT |
|
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED X1 kathlyn@cardillolaw |
|
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) | |
October 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENLARGE SERVICE OF PROCESS TIME PERIOD ---GRANTED 10/15/14 SDP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.