Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Suncoast Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Coopers Pond Owners Association, Florida Housing Finance Corp, Fox, Susan Lee, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER RETURNED ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE TO: ROBERT M COPLEN, PA, 10225 ULMERTON RD., SUITE 5A, LARGO, FL 33771 (ORD) PER ORDER SIGNED ON 12/02/14 BY REU |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING |
|
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS THIS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE, RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE AND RELEASE LIS PENDENS |
|
October 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING 10/28/14 @ 9 A.M. |
|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING OCTOBER 28,2014, AT 9:00A.M. |
|
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES | |
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED AFFIDAVITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS AND TIME EXPENDED |
|
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT NO AGREEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.