Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Piechal Romeo, Kimberly, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Lee, Susan, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Silver, C. Bernard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: December 30, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES OF ANSWER; SUSAN LEE (mailed 9/3/15) Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
July 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF KIMBERLY PIECHAL ROMEO; 6/18/14 @ 1:30 PM Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE **VOLUNTARY** 07-22-2014 @1:30PM Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION KIMBERLY PIECHAL ROMEO / 05-08-2014 @2PM Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.